PETERBOROUGH ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the improvement of the standard of motorcycle riding and the advancement of road safety for the benefit of the public and the rider.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 12 July 2005: Standard registration
- PECAM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frank Shannon | Chair | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Martin Mooney | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Wishart | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.06k | £3.88k | £6.47k | £6.21k | £5.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.64k | £1.43k | £4.44k | £7.71k | £9.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Walton Park
PETERBOROUGH
PE4 6GS
- Phone:
- 07941 634892
- Email:
- secretary@pecam.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window