Trustees GURU RAVIDASS EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1111617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr CHARAN BUNGER MBE Chair 20 February 2005
HANDSWORTH ROTARY CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr TREVOR JAMES Trustee 01 June 2019
THE TUTBURY CASTLE TRUST
Received: On time
Parkash Chand Mahey Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
BANT SANDHU Trustee 20 February 2008
None on record
HARMESH PAL Trustee 20 February 2007
None on record
SATYA CHUMBER Trustee 20 February 2007
None on record
ROSHAN DASS Trustee 20 May 2005
None on record
KAREN BALEY Trustee 20 February 2005
None on record
Dr KANTA KUMAR Ph.D. Trustee
None on record