NATIONAL YOUTH STRING ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1110462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 16 May 2017 On time Download