OFF CENTRE THEATRE

Charity number: 1112602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE COMMUNITY OF MONMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN THE ART OF DRAMA AND AMATEUR DRAMATICS BY THE PARTICIPATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, PLAYS AND OTHER DRAMATIC PRODUCTIONS FROM TIME TO TIME, TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £40,907
Total expenditure: £15,973

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire
  • Herefordshire
  • Monmouthshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OCT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEOFFREY MANNING Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
Stuart Robert MacFarlane Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
Tom Rigby Trustee 07 October 2014
PELHAM HALL
Received: 12 days late
BARBARA PATRICIA SPENCE Trustee
THE MONMOUTH SAVOY TRUST
Received: On time
ANNE AMELIA MACFARLANE Trustee
None on record
REVEREND BRIAN PEARCE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.09k £4.60k £8.72k £14.38k £40.91k
Total expenditure £20.11k £6.91k £12.51k £10.16k £15.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 Duchess Road
Osbaston
MONMOUTH
NP25 3HT
Phone:
01600715699