Trustees BLEAKHOLT ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Charity number: 1110503
Charity reporting is overdue by 176 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACKIE COOK | Chair | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Thornton | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cooper | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Hart | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Elston | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Johnstone | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Mahon | Trustee | 20 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DENISE CORRIGAN | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.