Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST. PAULS SCHOOL, YORK

Charity number: 1111254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 July 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required