ETTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running and maintaining the village hall for the benefit of the people of Etton to provide a meeting place for a range of community, social and recreational activities appropriate for a small village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 January 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Richardson | Chair | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karl Elliott | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Jackson | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Whitehead | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELLIOTT | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Michelle McCoy | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BARNES | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SLEIGHT | Trustee | 30 January 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.53k | £17.63k | £2.01k | £3.96k | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £2.57k | £4.40k | £10.12k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 September 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 14 JUNE 1971
Charitable objects
FOR A VILLAGE HALL AND READING ROOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF ETTON NEAR BEVERLEY IN THE EAST RIDING OF THE COUNTY OF YORK IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
ETTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Etton Village Hall
37 Main Street
Etton
Beverley
HU17 7PG
- Phone:
- 07903663617
- Email:
- villagehalletton@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window