CHALLENGE CANCER THROUGH ADVENTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of people living in the Peak District & surrounding areas who have been diagnosed with cancer or a terminal illness by the provision of grants to enable them to undertake adventure opportunities (including, but not limited to mountaineering canoeing and caving) in Great Britain and Abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 September 2005: Standard registration
- CHALLENGE CANCER (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Robinson | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn May | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corinna Lincoln | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Milne | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Durrant | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jack Turner | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DRYDALE | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.65k | £219 | £5 | £527 | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.99k | £895 | £569 | £701 | £4.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE PEAK DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH CANCER OR A TERMINAL ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO UNDERTAKE ADVENTURE OPPORTUNITIES (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, MOUNTAINEERING, CANOEING AND CAVING) IN GREAT BRITAIN AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
PEAK DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 PINGLE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S7 2LL
- Phone:
- 07852151941
- Email:
- info@challengecancer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window