CHASDEI TOVIM ME'OROS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CTM AIMS TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP, MAINLY IN THE UK AND ISRAEL. CTM OPERATES BY MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WHO PROVIDE THESE SERVICES, CTM RAISES FUNDS BY DISTRIBUTING AN ANNUAL CALENDAR, AND WITH ONGOING PROJECTS, ASKING PEOPLE TO HELP THOSE LESS FORTUNATE THAN THEM. CTM DOES NOT ACCEPT UNSOLICITED APPLICATIONS, BUT WILL CHOOSE RECIPIENTS OF THEIR FUNDING AT THEIR OWN DISCRETION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 28 July 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MENACHEM SALAMON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YOEL BLEIER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.26k | £16.37k | £51.34k | £20.86k | £2.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.57k | £7.46k | £41.31k | £23.79k | £5.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2021 | 256 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 6 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF THE POOR FEEBLE AND INFIRM AMONGST PEOPLE OF THE JEWISH FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BUT PRIMARILY IN ISRAEL 3.2 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE INCLUDING PAYMENTS BY WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN (WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST) TO INDIVIDUALS PROVIDED SUCH INDIVIDUALS ARE WITHIN THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 DURLSTON ROAD
LONDON
E5 8RP
- Phone:
- 02088062406
- Email:
- ymbctm@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window