FISHING 4 WISHES EDWARD REVILL'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1110612
Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sponsored Walks up Ben Nevis, and personal donations from family and friends

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FISHING4WISHES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN HUNSLEY Trustee
None on record
TERRY CONFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £120 £261 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.66k £80 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
39 Claremont Lane
Esher
KT10 9DT
Phone:
01372470299