GAYTON CHURCH HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1111145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 20 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 01 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required