MIDLANDS CABINDIANS COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1112028
Charity reporting is overdue by 161 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 161 days
Accounts and TAR 06 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 161 days
Annual return 06 March 2019 07 September 2020 245 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 March 2018 07 September 2020 610 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 06 March 2017 29 January 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 06 March 2016 27 July 2017 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 March 2016 Not Required