MIDLANDS CABINDIANS COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1112028
Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/03/2015 06/03/2016 06/03/2017 06/03/2018 06/03/2019
Total gross income £7.84k £1.46k £1.19k £5.53k £6.31k
Total expenditure £7.68k £1.37k £1.10k £5.20k £6.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A