Financial history ALOPECIA UK

Charity number: 1111304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £155.11k £198.77k £224.67k £684.30k £306.59k
Total expenditure £150.24k £181.30k £131.08k £262.95k £230.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £24.93k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £428.60k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £17.81k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £236.76k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.13k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £360.68k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £256.46k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £3.19k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £3.74k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £30.00k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £3.30k N/A