WEST LONDON SUDANESE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.55k £3.58k £2.90k £2.55k £1.00k
Total expenditure £2.12k £2.63k £1.98k £1.55k £125
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A