THE REFUGEE TRUST

Charity number: 1111772
Charity reporting is overdue by 401 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 401 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 401 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 December 2018 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required