THE REFUGEE TRUST

Charity number: 1111772
Charity reporting is overdue by 392 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £1.37k £1.37k £1.37k £1.30k £0
Total expenditure £4.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A