Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ARAMED FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1112298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 February 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 February 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required