Accounts and annual returns INTEGRAL ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1112515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window