Financial history INTEGRAL ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1112515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £295.36k £320.49k £418.72k £313.66k £156.17k
Total expenditure £219.32k £250.25k £364.47k £262.67k £252.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A