Trustees INTEGRAL ALLIANCE
Charity number: 1112515

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTHA HOLLEY NEWSOME MPH | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sean Copeland | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Melissa Anne Lipsett | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Myal Greene | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pui Si Chan | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Betina Gollander-Jensen | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bremer-Bennett | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stahl | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Archer | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Viso | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|||||
David Verboom | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adele Paterson | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Lukkien | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Johnson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Harris | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|||||
IAN MCINNES | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW FONTAINE MAURY | Trustee | 13 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN BUSSARD | Trustee | 13 October 2006 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK GUIBORAT | Trustee | 07 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
CECIL VAN MAELSAEKE | Trustee | 04 October 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.