THE LOWER RIVER NIGER OGBARU BENEVOLENT ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1112873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting Educational Activities/Development in The Lower River Niger Area, Ogbaru, in Nigeria Supporting Community Development in that area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES CHUKWUDUM JIDEOFOR OKWUOSA Chair
None on record
THERESA NKIRUKA OKAKWU Trustee
None on record
LOUIS NNAMDI OPUTA Trustee
None on record
VICTORIA EBELE ONUMONU Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA OSSAI Trustee
None on record
VICTOR OBIORA CHUKWUMA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 November 2024 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 11
Emmanuel House
Distin Street
London
SE11 6QL
Phone:
+447534912285