NEW STEP FOR AFRICAN COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity number: 1110686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 02 January 2017 On time Download