NEW STEP FOR AFRICAN COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity number: 1110686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £141.70k £147.90k £203.61k £156.61k £122.33k
Total expenditure £145.16k £146.54k £174.66k £154.25k £119.09k
Income from government contracts £705 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.41k £1.61k N/A £78.92k £30.00k