Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN EUROPEAN FAMILY NETWORK (AEFAN)

Charity number: 1111421
Charity reporting is overdue by 1489 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 393 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 393 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1123 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1123 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1489 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1489 days