THE LEICESTER CITY COMPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity number: 1110673
Charity reporting is 36 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not yet received
36 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not yet received
36 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 July 2019 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 May 2018 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)