ACE AFRICA (UK)

Charity number: 1111283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.18m £1.22m £975.18k £882.07k £776.43k
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.19m £1.08m £954.00k £790.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £871.20k £1.22m £884.05k £664.29k £718.17k
Income - Other trading activities £260.45k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £41.11k £167.76k £8.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £336 £2.28k £16 £13 £14
Income - Other £50.00k £0 £50.00k £50.00k £50.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £918.74k £930.28k £875.33k £699.37k £611.26k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £263.33k £155.49k £204.63k £128.79k
Expenditure - Governance £6.35k £5.50k £5.03k £5.83k £5.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £867.22k £0 £7.41k £693.54k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £50.00k £0 £50.00k £50.00k £50.00k