ISLAMIC RELIEF (UK)

Charity number: 1112111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 November 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 December 2018 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required