AFRICAN EDUCATIONAL CULTURAL AND HEALTH ORGANISATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1111023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 December 2020 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 September 2019 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 May 2017 On time Download