Accounts and annual returns MANSFIELD AND ASHFIELD BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1119395

Charity reporting is overdue by 767 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 37 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 37 days | |
Annual return | 02 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 402 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 402 days | |
Annual return | 02 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 767 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 767 days | |
Annual return | 02 January 2020 | 10 November 2023 | 1103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2020 | 10 November 2023 | 1103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 January 2019 | 10 November 2023 | 1469 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2019 | 10 November 2023 | 1469 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window