Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS R US ABERDARE
Charity number: 1111718
Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 82 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 82 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 July 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 August 2021 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 20 March 2021 | 324 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window