Financial history FRIENDS R US ABERDARE

Charity number: 1111718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £3.95k £3.43k £7.57k £7.57k £7.57k
Total expenditure £7.41k £6.37k £4.65k £2.02k £1.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A