Financial history REDEEMED CHURH OF GOD (RCCG) THE PATHFINDER PARISH

Charity number: 1110781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £149.25k £105.02k £103.55k £105.60k £106.00k
Total expenditure £157.79k £125.56k £103.69k £105.03k £114.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A