Financial history Mary Thompson Fund

Charity number: 1112610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £48.61k £42.16k £51.43k £41.25k £79.70k
Total expenditure £40.86k £40.33k £43.11k £46.61k £48.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A