THE FRIENDS OF BERKELEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1110904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 August 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required