Financial history ALL SAINTS CHORUS

Charity number: 1111845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £29.42k £18.41k £18.07k £32.34k £4.13k
Total expenditure £22.32k £17.75k £18.62k £29.90k £1.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.00k N/A N/A