Trustees THE SOCIETY OF BOTANICAL ARTISTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1110869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Marie Therese Morrin Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Rui Jiang Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Katya Sonja Katholing-Bloss Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Lara Shevaun Doherty Trustee 13 November 2020
None on record
Diane Pamela Marshall Trustee 13 November 2020
None on record
Claire Kathleen Ward Trustee 13 November 2020
None on record
Julia Ruth Patience Trustee 13 November 2020
None on record
Charlotte Linder Trustee 19 April 2018
None on record
Simon James Williams Trustee 24 April 2013
None on record