Accounts and annual returns OXFORD LIEDER

Charity number: 1111458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 16 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 16 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 23 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 23 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 18 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 17 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 17 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window