Accounts and annual returns THE APPLETHWAITE PARISH CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1111513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window