Financial history THE APPLETHWAITE PARISH CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1111513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £23.93k £10.23k £40.11k £9.25k £6.44k
Total expenditure £13.91k £20.46k £2.83k £13.64k £27.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A