Financial history HORSFORTH ST MARY'S R.C PRIMARY PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1111505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £5.31k £5.73k £3.26k £1.66k £809
Total expenditure £9.58k £9.47k £2.77k £1.80k £2.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A