Accounts and annual returns WORLD EYE CANCER HOPE

Charity number: 1111133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required