CANCERCARE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide assistance and support to those affected by Cancer whether financial or general.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR C LEMIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS JOHN MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE LEMIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.95k | £8.56k | £9.07k | £3.90k | £2.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.90k | £8.45k | £8.75k | £3.75k | £2.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 28 January 2025 | 333 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE (WHETHER FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE) OF PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO SUFFER FROM OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM ANY FORM OF CANCER, CANCER RELATED OR SIMILAR ILLNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 MAES Y GOG
RHYL
LL18 4QA
- Phone:
- 01745354944
- Email:
- office@cancercare-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window