Trustees THE KNOWLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1111085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David James Bower Chair 25 July 2005
NARTHEX SPARKHILL
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF TEMPLE BALSALL
Received: On time
William Leonard Charles Bohanna Trustee 26 February 2022
None on record
Alistair Innes Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Rachel Susan Marston Trustee 22 February 2020
None on record
Gavin Allan Trustee 22 February 2020
None on record
David Michael Fraley Trustee 22 February 2020
None on record
MARIA TERESA BROWN Trustee 13 April 2016
SOLIHULL CHANDOS CHOIR
Received: On time
Angela Christine Bird Trustee 11 March 2015
None on record
LILLA BAKER Trustee 18 April 2012
JOB'S CLOSE RESIDENTIAL HOME FOR THE ELDERLY
Received: On time
MARTIN WARR Trustee 10 February 2012
None on record
Dr DAVID NORMAN WATSON Trustee 15 June 2011
None on record
DAVID ARTHUR PINWELL Trustee 25 July 2005
CHURCHES AND INDUSTRY GROUP BIRMINGHAM-SOLIHULL
Received: On time
LEIGHTON TOWYN JONES Trustee 25 July 2005
None on record
ANDREW JOHN MARSTON Trustee
None on record