BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 1109141-16
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEMES DATED 23 APRIL 2001 AND 29 APRIL 2005 ( AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 20 MAY 2005.)
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (2) THE TRUSTEE MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OF BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS' SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (3) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEE MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED)WHO IS: (A) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE CITY OF BRISTOL; OR (B) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Registration history
  • 22 August 2005: Standard registration
  • 24 June 2015: Funds received from 1109141-32 THE CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES OF THE PARISH OF WESTBU...
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of