Financial history THE JOHN HOLT CANCER FOUNDATION (WARRINGTON)

Charity number: 1111668
Charity reporting is overdue by 1222 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £43.44k £43.41k £56.52k £59.46k £51.01k
Total expenditure £50.95k £43.18k £56.27k £65.84k £80.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £1.02k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0