Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST JAMES, BIDDENHAM

Charity number: 1111855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required