Accounts and annual returns PROMISEDLAND MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1111246
Charity reporting is overdue by 1065 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 335 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 335 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 700 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 700 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1065 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1065 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 13 August 2019 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 13 August 2019 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 12 August 2019 469 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 August 2019 469 days late Download Open in new window