HYMAN FINE HOUSE FUNDRAISING COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of "in house" entertainment and activities for the residents of Hyman Fine House, together with recreational outings and visits to theatres, cinemas and other entertainments. In addition, organising volunteers to visit the residents regularly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- East Sussex
Governance
- 24 October 2005: Standard registration
- 07 October 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HFHFC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.91k | £8.91k | £3.73k | £4.98k | £2.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.56k | £7.96k | £6.57k | £5.51k | £6.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 19 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 19 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 13 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 08 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED ON 26TH SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE RESIDENTS OF HYMAN FINE HOUSE, EAST SUSSEX, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window