Accounts and annual returns ACTIVE LUTON

Charity number: 1111804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window